This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2020 at 13:59:18 (UTC).

Chelsea Chandler vs Jose C. Zavala et al.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Chelsea Chandler filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Jose C Zavala. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mulvihill, Michael and Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3965

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mulvihill, Michael

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chandler, Chelsea

Defendants

Delgado-Zavala, Claudia

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, Uad June 23, 1989

Gilchrist-Raab, Callie

Zavala, Jose C.

Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, a California corporation

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Delaware limited company

Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Clarence Andrew Blakely, an unmarried man, as his sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely's Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989

Gilchrist-Raab, Callie P.

Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Cindi S. Posadas, a married woman, as her sole and separate propoerty, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989

Callie Gilchrist-Raab, Successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, Uad June 23, 1989

Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Kimberly J. Gilchrist, an unmarried woman, as her sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989

Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, UAD June 23, 1989

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wang, Jacky P

Defendant Attorney

Zuberi, Nabeel

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Kimberly J. Gilchrist, an unmarried woman, as her sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Callie Gilchrist-Raab, Successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, Uad June 23, 1989 Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 served on 04/06/2020 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Section 6 incomplete. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

request for entry of default

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Callie Gilchrist-Raab Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

request for entry of default

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab served on 04/06/2020 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Section 6 incomplete. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

request for entry of default

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Participant: Callie Gilchrist-Raab (Defendant); Participant: Callie Gilchrist-Raab, Successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, Uad June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Cindi S. Posadas, a married woman, as her sole and separate propoerty, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Clarence Andrew Blakely, an unmarried man, as his sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely's Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Kimberly J. Gilchrist, an unmarried woman, as her sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Chelsea Chandler (Plaintiff); Participant: Claudia Delgado-Zavala (Defendant); Participant: Jose C. Zavala (Defendant); Participant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Delaware limited company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Further Case Management Conference filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication , set for 10/22/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Participant: Callie Gilchrist-Raab (Defendant); Participant: Callie Gilchrist-Raab, Successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, Uad June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Cindi S. Posadas, a married woman, as her sole and separate propoerty, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Clarence Andrew Blakely, an unmarried man, as his sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely's Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Kimberly J. Gilchrist, an unmarried woman, as her sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 (Defendant); Participant: Chelsea Chandler (Plaintiff); Participant: Claudia Delgado-Zavala (Defendant); Participant: Jose C. Zavala (Defendant); Participant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, a Delaware limited company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/22/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on June 22, 2020. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Cindi S. Posadas, a married woman, as her sole and separate propoerty, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Callie Gilchrist-Raab, Successor Trustee of the Hazel Blakely Survivor's Trust, Uad June 23, 1989 Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Callie P. Gilchrist-Raab, as Trustee for Kimberly J. Gilchrist, an unmarried woman, as her sole and separate property, created under The Hazel Blakely Marital Trust, UAD June 23, 1989 Not Entered Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/20/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Chandler, Chelsea. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Chelsea Chandler in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 488594. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Jacky P Wang, retained for Chelsea Chandler . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Successor Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Aivazian 2016 Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUBERI, NABEEL M