This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 11:09:25 (UTC).

Chase Bank USA NA vs. Rosa M Ceja

Case Summary

On 11/08/2010 Chase Bank USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rosa M Ceja. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8679

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chase Bank Usa Na

Defendant

Ceja, Rosa M

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

01/10/2013: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Declaration Of Counsel RE: Interest

01/26/2011: Declaration Of Counsel RE: Interest

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

01/26/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Proof of Service Of Summons

11/17/2010: Proof of Service Of Summons

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/09/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

11/09/2010: Payment Receipt

SUM100 Summons - Civil

11/08/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/08/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Chase Bank USA'S Complaint

11/08/2010: Chase Bank USA'S Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Status of Chase Bank USA NA updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Status of Rosa Ceja updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Complaint associated on 01/10/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal as to Chase Bank USA NA only. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal as to Ceja, Rosa M only. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Address for Hallie Zimmerman selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 11/09/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 11/09/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Complaint filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 11/09/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less