This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/26/2018 at 00:51:01 (UTC).

Charles Eavenson vs. Byron Casey

Case Summary

On 05/08/2013 Charles Eavenson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Byron Casey. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4754

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eavenson, Charles

Defendants

Valdez, Stephanie

Casey, Byron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sihota, Kirandeep Kaur

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

07/31/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/27/2013: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

06/14/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

06/14/2013: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/06/2013: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/04/2013: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/04/2013: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice that you have been sued

05/08/2013: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

05/08/2013: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Writ of Execution Returned filed by Eavenson, Charles on 08/31/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 07/31/2013, transaction number 1204070 and receipt number 318877. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Complaint (showing full satisfaction as to possession only.) dis-associated on 07/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Writ of Possession Returned (showing full satisfaction as to possession only.) updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Judgment by Court - After Trial (re interest) associated on 07/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Judgment by Court - After Trial (showing zero for costs and credits and 34.56 interest.) associated on 07/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Case status updated to Post Judgment effective 07/31/2013 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2013
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Original Summons filed by Eavenson, Charles on 05/08/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Eavenson, Charles on 05/08/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Complaint filed by Eavenson, Charles on 05/08/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.