This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 05:45:37 (UTC).

Chang Income Property Partnership vs. Harnden

Case Summary

On 01/18/2012 Chang Income Property Partnership filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Harnden. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0596

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chang Income Property Partnership, Lp, Union North Apartments

Defendants

Harnden, Chris

Harnden, Gabriel

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

04/22/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

06/13/2012: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Notice of Court's Order to Show

04/23/2012: Notice of Court's Order to Show

Notice That You've Been Sued

01/19/2012: Notice That You've Been Sued

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

01/18/2012: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/18/2012: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/18/2012: Complaint

Notice that you have been sued

01/18/2012: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

01/18/2012: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Status of Chris Harnden updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Status of Gabriel Harnden updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Status of Chang Income Property Partnership, LP, Union North Apartments updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Complaint associated on 06/18/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Motion - Other (CLM) - RE OSC scheduled for 07/24/2014 at 03:00:00 PM in M2 was vacated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2012
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Case title updated to Chang Income Property Partnership vs. Harnden effective 01/18/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • San Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Notice that you have been sued generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Chang Income Property Partnership, LP, Union North Apartments on 01/18/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chang Income Property Partnership, LP, Union North Apartments on 01/18/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Complaint filed by Chang Income Property Partnership, LP, Union North Apartments on 01/18/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.