This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 12:33:50 (UTC).

Central Valley's Elite Roofing Company Inc vs. Billy Davis

Case Summary

On 03/08/2011 Central Valley's Elite Roofing Company Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Billy Davis. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************3447

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Central Valley'S Elite Roofing Company Inc

Defendant

Davis, Billy

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

03/08/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Payment Receipt

03/08/2011: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

03/08/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

SC109 Authorization to Appear

03/08/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

Proof of Service

04/12/2011: Proof of Service

Minute Order

04/22/2011: Minute Order

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

04/22/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

04/26/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Payment Receipt

06/08/2011: Payment Receipt

Proof of Service

06/17/2011: Proof of Service

Minute Order

07/18/2011: Minute Order

SC290 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims)

08/25/2011: SC290 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketThe status of Award2 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Central Valley's Elite Roofing Company Inc on 08/25/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SC) heard 07/18/2011 09:30:00 AM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - PERSONAL (Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination. Judgment Debtors Statement of Assets) filed by Central Valley's Elite Roofing Company Inc on 06/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketScheduling auto case clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketFull payment was recorded on 06/08/2011 for 806054. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 36B - JDX in the amount of 40.00 on 06/08/2011, transaction number 806054 and receipt number 216423. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 03/08/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (by Teresa Morten) filed by Central Valley's Elite Roofing Company Inc on 03/08/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial - Business (SC) - Principal, 2,121.54Costs, 50.00 scheduled for 04/22/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in T2 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Central Valley's Elite Roofing Company Inc on 03/08/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less