This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:43 (UTC).

Cecilia J Ochoa vs Yolanda Rangel

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Cecilia J Ochoa filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Yolanda Rangel. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1892

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ochoa, Cecilia J

Defendant

Rangel, Yolanda

 

Court Documents

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Ochoa, Cecilia J. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service as to Yolanda Rangel (Substituted service). fee $40.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Ochoa, Cecilia J. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/04/2016 02:45 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/04/2016 02:45 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on April 4, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 04/04/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Robert Baysinger in Department J2. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $0.50, receipt number 44372. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear filed by Ochoa, Cecilia J. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Yolanda Rangel (Substituted service). fee $40.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/28/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Principal 5000.00, Costs 50.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 34468. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Ochoa, Cecilia J. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less