This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:56 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc vs Manuel Lara

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Cavalry Spv I, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Manuel Lara. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1907

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank

Cavalry Spv I, LLC, as asignee of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Lara, Manuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millea, Amanda

 

Court Documents

Statement of Evidence

Statement of Evidence: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration of Venue filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank against Manuel Lara in the amount of $6944.59. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Manuel Lara served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank against Manuel Lara in the amount of $6944.59. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Request for Default against Manuel Lara Entered Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Evidence: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc, as asignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Manuel Lara served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Cavalry Spv I, Llc. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Amanda Millea, retained for Cavalry Spv I, Llc . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34592. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less