This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 19:25:16 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. vs Robert Ramos

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Robert Ramos. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1222

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Ramos, Robert

Stockton, CA 95209-2319

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Robert Ramos served on 12/22/2022 by Substituted Service. $77.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Robert Ramos served on 12/22/2022 by Substituted Service. $77.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Cavalry SPV I in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 793636.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Robert Scott Kennard, retained for Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard