This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/03/2023 at 04:23:19 (UTC).

North Mill Equipment Finance LLC vs NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany et al.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 North Mill Equipment Finance LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Banuelos, Blanca. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7543

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Banuelos, Blanca

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North Mill Equipment Finance LLC

Defendants

NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany

Singh, Aasdeep

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rymsza, Christina

 

Court Documents

RA020 Order regarding Remote Appearance

Order on Request for Telephonic Appearance - Granted as to 11/29/2023 ONLY as to North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Ellen W. Miller in Support of Application for Writs of Possession and Turn Over Orders filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Notice to Filing Party

07/20/2023: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Order

Order for Writ of Possession filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Order

Order for Writ of Possession filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Application for Writ, Application for Writ held on 11/29/2023 09:00 AM .

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published - Applications for Writ of Possession

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany, Aasdeep Singh Entered

Notice

Notice Reassignment of Judicial Officer and Change of Hearing Location filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany served on 09/06/2023 by Substituted Service. $66.98.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Aasdeep Singh served on 09/06/2023 by Substituted Service. $111.98.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (BB)

Hearing regarding: Application for Writ Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession, set for 11/29/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.

RA-010 Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Order filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

Application for Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/16/2024

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; Aasdeep Singh (Defendant); NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany (Defendant); North Mill Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

HearingHearing Type: Application for Writ; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; Aasdeep Singh (Defendant); North Mill Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

HearingHearing Type: Application for Writ; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany (Defendant); North Mill Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Writ of Possession filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Writ of Possession filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketHearing re: Application for Writ held on November 29, 2023.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketHearing re: Application for Writ held on November 29, 2023.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Application for Writ, Application for Writ held on 11/29/2023 09:00 AM .; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketTentative Ruling published - Applications for Writ of Possession; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against NS Dhot Trucking Inc, a California Complany, Aasdeep Singh Entered; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Application for Writ Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession, set for 11/29/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/16/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketPayment received by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 850696.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketAttorney, Christina Rymsza, retained for North Mill Equipment Finance LLC .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less