This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 06:05:16 (UTC).

Cassandra Mercedes Santos vs Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 Cassandra Mercedes Santos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3850

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes Santos, Cassandra

Defendant

Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenstein, Michael H.

Defendant Attorney

Stewart, Sharon L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mercedes Santos, Cassandra.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mercedes Santos, Cassandra.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation served on 04/19/2023 by Personal Service. $30.00.

Answer

Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Cassandra Mercedes Santos (Plaintiff); Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Sharon L. Stewart, retained for Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Subaru of America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Inc, Subaru of America in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 836469.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Subaru of America, Inc, a New Jersey Corporation served on 04/19/2023 by Personal Service. $30.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/23/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mercedes Santos, Cassandra.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mercedes Santos, Cassandra.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Cassandra Mercedes Santos in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 827035.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Michael H. Rosenstein, retained for Cassandra Mercedes Santos .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less