This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 19:12:50 (UTC).

California Contractors Network vs Richard Jesse Guerrero et al.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 California Contractors Network filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Richard Jesse Guerrero. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2850

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Contractors Network

Defendants

Guerrero, Cinda K

Guerrero, Richard Jesse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Soleimanpour, Matthew

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Contractors Network.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by California Contractors Network.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Assignment.

Application and Order

Application and Order to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Judge Abdallah on 09/11/2023 filed by California Contractors Network.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; California Contractors Network (Plaintiff); Cinda K Guerrero (Defendant); Richard Jesse Guerrero (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; California Contractors Network (Plaintiff); Cinda K Guerrero (Defendant); Richard Jesse Guerrero (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/09/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: CMC Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Judge Abdallah on 09/11/2023 filed by California Contractors Network.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketPayment received by California Contractors Network in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 865914.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/28/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Contractors Network.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by California Contractors Network.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketPayment received by California Contractors Network in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 821403.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Matthew Soleimanpour, retained for California Contractors Network .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less