This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/07/2023 at 07:06:20 (UTC).

Fred Nomelli et al. vs FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 Fred Nomelli filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4516

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deverux, Roberta

Nomelli, Fred

Defendant

FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenstein, Michael H.

Defendant Attorney

Gregg, Michael J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Nomelli, Fred.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nomelli, Fred.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 05/08/2023 by Personal Service. $30.00.

Answer

Defendant FCA US LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Fred Nomelli (Plaintiff); Roberta Deverux (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Michael J. Gregg, retained for FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant FCA US LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketPayment received by a FCA US LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 841659.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 05/08/2023 by Personal Service. $30.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/02/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Michael H. Rosenstein, retained for Roberta Deverux .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nomelli, Fred.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Nomelli, Fred.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Fred Nomelli in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 831980.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Michael H. Rosenstein, retained for Fred Nomelli .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less