This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/15/2023 at 16:08:09 (UTC).

PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation vs JBF WAREHOUSE & CROSS DOCK LOGISTICS INC. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2023 PACTRA USA, INC , a California Corporation filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JBF WAREHOUSE CROSS DOCK LOGISTICS INC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zendejas, Esmeralda. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9269

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zendejas, Esmeralda

 

Court Documents

RA020 Order regarding Remote Appearance

Order on Request for Telephonic Appearance - Denied as to PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to JBF LOGISTICS, an unknown entity served on 08/31/2023 by Substituted Service. .

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to JBF WAREHOUSE & CROSS DOCK LOGISTICS INC. served on 08/31/2023 by Substituted Service. .

Proof of Service

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to J. BENTON FURROW, INC. served on 08/31/2023 by Substituted Service. . Does not match Complaint

Proof of Service

Summons returned Unserved / Invalid as to JBF WAREHOUSE & CROSS DOCK LOGISTICS INC.. ~ Name Does not match Summons and Summons does not match Complaint.

Proof of Service

Summons returned Unserved / Invalid as to JBF LOGISTICS, an unknown entity. Name on POS does not match that on the Summons Nor Complaint.

Proof of Service

Summons returned Unserved / Invalid as to J. BENTON FURROW, INC.. ~ Name Does not match Summons and Summons does not match Complaint.

UD105 Answer

~ANSWER~ First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by J. BENTON FURROW, INC.; and JBF LOGISTICS, an unknown entity.; and JBF WAREHOUSE & CROSS DOCK LOGISTICS INC along with POS with representation.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023

HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: M2; Result: Vacated; Judge: Esmeralda Zendejas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation, JBF WAREHOUSE & CROSS DOCK LOGISTICS INC., JBF LOGISTICS, an unknown entity, J. BENTON FURROW, INC. Entered without prejudice.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice for Officers, Directors and Managing Agents of JBF Warehouse & Cross Dock Logistics Inc. to Appear at Trial filed by PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Esmeralda Zendejas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 11/07/2023 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Esmeralda Zendejas in Department M2.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation & Order to Continue Court Trial entered and filed. **Scanned**; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
08/28/2023

DocketPayment received in the amount of $19.00, receipt number 862809.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketPayment received by Northern California Legal Support Services, Inc in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 862624.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketAttorney, Jared C. Xu, retained for PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation .; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PACTRA USA, INC., a California Corporation.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less