This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 19:02:01 (UTC).

Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation vs Parker-Hannfin Corporation, an Ohio corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Parker-Hannfin Corporation, an Ohio corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4090

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation

Defendants

Johnstone Supply , LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,

Parker-Hannfin Corporation, an Ohio corporation

Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Javan, Robert B.

Defendant Attorney

Strinieri, Teresa M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil-COVID-19 Rental Debt (over $25,000) filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

summons

Summons issued and filed.

Consent for electronic service

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

Notice

Notice of Action Filed filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

CM015 Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

Order

Order on Notice of Related Cases filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/11/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.

MC040 Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2023 08:30 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Johnstone Supply , LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, (Defendant); Parker-Hannfin Corporation, an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Johnstone Supply , LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, (Defendant); Parker-Hannfin Corporation, an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Johnstone Supply , LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, (Defendant); Parker-Hannfin Corporation, an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 11/08/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 11, 2023.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint filed by Refrigeration Supplies Distributor, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/18/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil-COVID-19 Rental Debt (over $25,000) filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketPayment received by a Insurance Company of the West in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 828618.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Robert B. Javan, retained for Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less