This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/23/2023 at 14:05:56 (UTC).

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. vs Xclusive Wireless Resources, LLC DBA Xclusive Wireless Resources LLC ADBA Xclusive Wireless Resources

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Xclusive Wireless Resources, LLC DBA Xclusive Wireless Resources LLC ADBA Xclusive Wireless Resources. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Banuelos, Blanca. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9783

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Banuelos, Blanca

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.

Defendant

Xclusive Wireless Resources, LLC DBA Xclusive Wireless Resources LLC ADBA Xclusive Wireless Resources

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jyoo, Joseph

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

pos010-Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Xclusive Wireless Resources, LLC DBA Xclusive Wireless Resources LLC ADBA Xclusive Wireless Resources served on 09/20/2023 by Substituted Service. $116.90.

 

Docket Entries

03/12/2024

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); Xclusive Wireless Resources, LLC DBA Xclusive Wireless Resources LLC ADBA Xclusive Wireless Resources (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Xclusive Wireless Resources, LLC DBA Xclusive Wireless Resources LLC ADBA Xclusive Wireless Resources served on 09/20/2023 by Substituted Service. $116.90.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketBlanca Banuelos Assigned. BATCH; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/12/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Blanca Banuelos in Department 10B.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketPayment received by Inc. Creditors Adjustment Bureau in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 867322.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketAttorney, Joseph Jyoo, retained for Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less