This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 14:04:54 (UTC).

Saysamone Nanthanvong vs United Parcel Service, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Saysamone Nanthanvong filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9774

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nanthanvong, Saysamone

Defendants

Minor, Justin

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Varlack, Tiega-Noel

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to Saysamone Nanthanvong.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to Saysamone Nanthanvong.

FW006 Request for hearing About Court Fee Waiver Order

Request for Hearing About Court Fees filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.

FW007 Notice of Hearing About Court Fees

Notice of Hearing About Court Fees - Granted as to Saysamone Nanthanvong.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Fee Waiver Hearing , set for 11/06/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing held on 11/06/2023 09:00 AM .

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to United Parcel Service, Inc. served on 10/16/2023 by Personal Service. $42.50.

Notice

Notice of Removal filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..

 

Docket Entries

03/11/2024

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Justin Minor (Defendant); Saysamone Nanthanvong (Plaintiff); United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketHearing Result: CMC Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Removal filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketFirst Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketPayment received by Inc. United Parcel Service in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 883591.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketCase status updated to Removed to Federal Court.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to United Parcel Service, Inc. served on 10/16/2023 by Personal Service. $42.50.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

HearingHearing Type: Fee Waiver Hearing; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing held on 11/06/2023 09:00 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketHearing re: Fee Waiver Hearing held on November 6, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Hearing About Court Fees filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to Saysamone Nanthanvong.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/11/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Nanthanvong, Saysamone.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketAttorney, Tiega-Noel Varlack, retained for Saysamone Nanthanvong .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less