This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/06/2023 at 05:06:42 (UTC).

PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services vs Bhangu Transport, Inc., a California corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2023 PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bhangu Transport, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Banuelos, Blanca. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9332

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Banuelos, Blanca

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services

Defendants

Bhangu Transport, Inc., a California corporation

Singh, Jagtar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ito, Ken I.

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

09/05/2023: Proposed Order

Motion

Motion for Writ of Possession After Hearing by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Michael McGinley in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

Motion

Motion for Writ of Possession After Hearing filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does without Prejudice filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

pos010-Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jagtar Singh served on 09/19/2023 by Substituted Service. $79.95.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Jagtar Singh Not Entered

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Bhangu Transport, Inc., a California corporation Entered

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

pos010-Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Bhangu Transport, Inc., a California corporation served on 09/19/2023 by Substituted Service. $109.95.

Application

Application for Writ of Possession filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Orders filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/27/2024

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2023

HearingHearing Type: Application for Writ; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2023

HearingHearing Type: Application for Writ; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Does without Prejudice filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jagtar Singh served on 09/19/2023 by Substituted Service. $79.95.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Jagtar Singh Not Entered; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Bhangu Transport, Inc., a California corporation Entered; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
09/05/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Application for Writ Appl. for Writ of Possession as to Jagtar Singh, set for 12/27/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Blanca Banuelos in Department 10B.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Application for Writ Appl. for Writ of Possession as to Bhangu Transport Inc., set for 12/27/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Blanca Banuelos in Department 10B.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/27/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Blanca Banuelos in Department 10B.; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketPayment received by National PNC Bank in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 863346.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketAttorney, Ken I. Ito, retained for PNC Bank, National Association, successor to PNC Equipment Finance, LLC dba Wabash National Financial Services .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less