This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/28/2023 at 08:03:30 (UTC).

Ishrat Badar vs General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Ishrat Badar filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5369

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Badar, Ishrat

Defendant

General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zolonz, Adam M.

Defendant Attorney

Davis, Stacey S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Badar, Ishrat.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Badar, Ishrat.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 05/31/2023 by Personal Service. $163.75.

Answer

General Motors LLC's answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Ishrat Badar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Stacey S. Davis, retained for General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Motors LLC's answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketPayment received by LLC, General Motors in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 846281.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 05/31/2023 by Personal Service. $163.75.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/21/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Badar, Ishrat.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Badar, Ishrat.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Ishrat Badar in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 837511.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Adam M. Zolonz, retained for Ishrat Badar .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less