This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 04:07:14 (UTC).

Carol Yoshiko Bernardo vs Anthony Viray Bernardo Jr

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Carol Yoshiko Bernardo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Anthony Viray Bernardo Jr. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0114

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bernardo, Carol Yoshiko

Respondent

Bernardo, Anthony Viray Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Butler, Dianne Drew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

12/20/2023

HearingHearing Type: Review; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Anthony Viray Bernardo Jr (Respondent); Carol Yoshiko Bernardo (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Bernardo, Anthony Viray Jr.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Bernardo, Anthony Viray Jr.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketProof of Service of FL-140, FL-150, and Property Declaration as to Carol Yoshiko Bernardo served on 11/01/2023 by Personal Service. .; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 5A; Result: Held; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Anthony Viray Bernardo Jr (Respondent); Carol Yoshiko Bernardo (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketHearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on November 1, 2023.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketMinutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 11/01/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Review Re: Status of Home Appraisal & Buy-Out, set for 12/20/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of FL-300, FL-150 as to Anthony Viray Bernardo Jr served on 08/28/2023 by Mailing. .; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petrs RFO Spousal Support, Other: Joint Appraisal re FR by Oak Valley Appraisal Services; Husband Ordered to Prepare & Serve his PPDs ***NO POS, set for 11/01/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
07/12/2023

DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Bernardo, Carol Yoshiko.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023

DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Bernardo, Anthony Viray Jr.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Anthony Bernardo in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 810486.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Anthony Viray Bernardo Jr filed. Served on 01/20/2023. Method of Service: Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Carol Yoshiko Bernardo.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Dianne Drew Butler, retained for Carol Yoshiko Bernardo .; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Bernardo, Carol Yoshiko.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Bernardo, Carol Yoshiko.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less