This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 08:06:11 (UTC).

Carol Showers vs Steven Paul Showers

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 Carol Showers filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Steven Paul Showers. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0357

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Showers, Carol

Respondent

Showers, Steven Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ellis, Albert M

Respondent Attorney

Thiessen, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 5A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Carol Showers (Petitioner); Steven Paul Showers (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketGolden Rod; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Carol Showers, Steven Paul Showers Not Entered.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Request for Order, Declaration of Albert Ellis and Income and Expense Declaration as to Steven Paul Showers served on 03/07/2023 by Mailing.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petitioner's RFO Spousal Support and Attorney's Fees and Costs *No POS, set for 04/14/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Showers, Carol.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Albert M. Ellis in Support of an Award for Attorney Fees to Petitioner filed by Showers, Carol.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketRFO-Request for Order (Initial) filed by Showers, Carol.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Carol Showers in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 816414.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Steven Paul Showers filed. Served on 02/01/2023. Method of Service: Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Lisa Thiessen, retained for Steven Paul Showers .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of FL-120 as to Carol Showers served on 02/02/2023 by Mailing. .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Showers, Steven Paul.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Steven Showers in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 809000.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Showers, Carol.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Albert Ellis in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 806293.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Albert M Ellis, Hakeem Ellis & Marengo retained for Carol Showers .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less