This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:38 (UTC).

Carol Lyon vs Jeff Hunt et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Carol Lyon filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jeff Hunt. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1891

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lyon, Carol

Defendants

Hunt, Jeff

Moreno, Patricia

Moreno, Jon

 

Court Documents

SC290 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Lyon, Carol. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Decision

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

04/21/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/21/2016 07:44 AM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service as to Carol Lyon (Personal) on 3/15/2016. Proof of Service form contains incorrect hearing date. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court Trial PLTF's: Principal $9839.75 Costs $155.00DEFT's: Principal $9886.00 Costs $155.00, set for 04/11/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC150 Request to Postpone Trial

Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served) filed by Hunt, Jeff. Action Type: Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC120 Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5000 to $10,000 filed by Hunt, Jeff; Moreno, Jon; Moreno, Patricia. Action Type: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5000 to $10,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC152 Order on Request to Postpone Trial

Order on Request to Postpone Trial Granted. See order filed herein. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Jeff Hunt. Costs $0.00 Incomplete proof of service, question #3 not checked. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Patricia Moreno. Costs Incomplete proof of service, question #3 not checked. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Jon Moreno. Costs Incomplete proof of service, question #3 not checked. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Lyon, Carol. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Lyon, Carol. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 04/21/2016 07:44 AM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on April 11, 2016. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Carol Lyon (Personal) on 3/15/2016. Proof of Service form contains incorrect hearing date. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial PLTF's: Principal $9839.75 Costs $155.00DEFT's: Principal $9886.00 Costs $155.00, set for 04/11/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5000 to $10,000 filed by Hunt, Jeff; Moreno, Jon; Moreno, Patricia. Action Type: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5000 to $10,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 40672. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $9839.75 Costs $75.00, set for 04/04/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial Granted. See order filed herein. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $10.00. Receipt number 40615. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served) filed by Hunt, Jeff. Action Type: Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Jon Moreno. Costs Incomplete proof of service, question #3 not checked. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Patricia Moreno. Costs Incomplete proof of service, question #3 not checked. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service returned Unserved as to Jeff Hunt. Costs $0.00 Incomplete proof of service, question #3 not checked. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $9839.75 Costs $75.00, set for 03/21/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 34462. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Lyon, Carol. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less