This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/30/2020 at 13:58:32 (UTC).

Carly Diane Moore vs Justin Patrick Dumas

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Carly Diane Moore filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Justin Patrick Dumas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fattarsi, Jonathan W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3469

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

04/03/2020

HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jonathan W. Fattarsi; Participant: Carly Diane Moore (Petitioner); Participant: Justin Patrick Dumas (Respondent)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketOther Court Ordered Dismissal as to Carly Diane Moore, Justin Patrick Dumas Entered. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketHearing Result: Vacated ~ No fees paid Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 04/03/2020 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Fattarsi in Department M2. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Carly Diane Moore. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Denied and filed on 03/10/2020. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Moore, Carly Diane. Action Type: Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Moore, Carly Diane. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less