This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/21/2018 at 07:47:09 (UTC).

Carlos Weisser vs Janeth Anna Victoria Weisser

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 Carlos Weisser filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Janeth Anna Victoria Weisser. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6482

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Weisser, Carlos

Respondent

Weisser, Janeth Anna Victoria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Smith, Julie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • Trial Brief filed by Weisser, Janeth Anna Victoria. Action Type: Trial Brief; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on July 23, 2018.Resulted in error - Vacated KM Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Settlement Conference Further Settlement Conference/ Trial Setting, set for 08/20/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 07/09/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Hearing re: Settlement Conference held on July 9, 2018. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Settlement Conference Further S/C, set for 07/09/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department 4A. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Hearing re: Settlement Conference held on June 18, 2018. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 06/18/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petitioner's Settlement Conference Statement filed by Weisser, Carlos. Action Type: Settlement Conference Statement; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Janeth Anna Victoria Weisser. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Attorney, Julie Smith, retained for Janeth Anna Victoria Weisser . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Proof of service filed by Weisser, Janeth Anna Victoria. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Weisser, Janeth Anna Victoria. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Weisser, Janeth Anna Victoria. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Janeth Anna Victoria Weisser filed. Served on 01/14/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Payment received by Carlos Weisser in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 122466. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Weisser, Carlos. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Julie