This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2023 at 10:03:13 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs Ryan Fetzer

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Capital One, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ryan Fetzer. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0550

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Fetzer, Ryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terry, Amber

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

Declaration of Non Service

Declaration of Non Service filed by Capital One, N.A..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ryan Fetzer served on 02/27/2023 by Personal Service. $77.00.

Statement

Statement of Account filed by Capital One, N.A..

MC030 Declaration

Declaration Re: --Research to determine Military status of Defendant(s); -- Notice pursuant to CCP 1033(b)(2) filed by Capital One, N.A..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Capital One, N.A..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Ryan Fetzer Entered

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Capital One, N.A. against Ryan Fetzer in the amount of 6108.10.

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Capital One, N.A. against Ryan Fetzer in the amount of 6108.10.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re: --Research to determine Military status of Defendant(s); -- Notice pursuant to CCP 1033(b)(2) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Account filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Ryan Fetzer Entered; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ryan Fetzer served on 02/27/2023 by Personal Service. $77.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Non Service filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by N.A. Capital One in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806137.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Amber Terry, retained for Capital One, N.A. .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less