This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 19:16:42 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs Marisol Munoz

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Capital One, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marisol Munoz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1185

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Munoz, Marisol

Lodi, CA 95242-2955

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wachtman, Jeremy

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Marisol Munoz served on 12/27/2022 by Substituted Service. $77.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Marisol Munoz served on 12/27/2022 by Substituted Service. $77.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPayment received by N.A. Capital One in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 793212.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Jeremy Wachtman, retained for Capital One, N.A. .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wachtman, Jeremy