This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 18:00:13 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs Henry M Maynard

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Capital One, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Henry M Maynard. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0579

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Maynard, Henry M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wachtman, Jeremy

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Henry M Maynard served on 02/13/2023 by Substituted Service. $77.00.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Henry M Maynard Entered

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Capital One, N.A..

MC030 Declaration

Declaration Re: Research to Determine Military Status of Defendant (s) Notice Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Capital One, N.A..

Statement

Statement of Accounts filed by Capital One, N.A..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Capital One, N.A. against Henry M Maynard in the amount of $7,329.40.

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Capital One, N.A. against Henry M Maynard in the amount of $7,329.40.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Henry M Maynard Entered; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re: Research to Determine Military Status of Defendant (s) Notice Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Accounts filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Court Judgment filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Henry M Maynard served on 02/13/2023 by Substituted Service. $77.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by N.A. Capital One in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806334.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Jeremy Wachtman, retained for Capital One, N.A. .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less