This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 17:33:41 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs Donna F Byrd

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Capital One, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Donna F Byrd. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0616

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Donna F Byrd served on 02/14/2023 by Substituted Service. $77.00.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Capital One, N.A., Donna F Byrd Entered.

 

Docket Entries

02/28/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Capital One, N.A., Donna F Byrd Entered.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Donna F Byrd served on 02/14/2023 by Substituted Service. $77.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by N.A. Capital One in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806531.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Jeremy Wachtman, retained for Capital One, N.A. .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less