This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 11:03:54 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs Abel R Martinez

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Capital One, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Abel R Martinez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1809

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Martinez, Abel R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aposhian, George

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..

Declaration

Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status filed by Capital One, N.A..

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Capital One, N.A..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Abel R Martinez served on 03/10/2023 by Substituted Service. $89.00.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Capital One, N.A..

Declaration

Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status filed by Capital One, N.A..

Declaration

Declaration for Reimbursement of Costs CCP 1033 filed by Capital One, N.A..

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Plaintiff's Declaration / Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d) filed by Capital One, N.A..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Capital One, N.A..

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Reimbursement of Costs CCP 1033 filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Declaration / Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Abel R Martinez served on 03/10/2023 by Substituted Service. $89.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Capital One, N.A..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketPayment received by N.A. Capital One in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 814191.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketAttorney, George Aposhian, retained for Capital One, N.A. .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less