This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 07:03:54 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) vs. Susan Walker

Case Summary

On 07/26/2013 Capital One Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Susan Walker. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7516

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA)

Defendant

Walker, Susan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patenaude, Victor

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

07/26/2013: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

07/26/2013: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Notice to Filing Party

11/06/2013: Notice to Filing Party

Payment Receipt

05/21/2014: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/16/2015: Payment Receipt

Writ Return

Writ Return filed. Judge: CONVERSION.

Writ Return

01/05/2016: Writ Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit Return filed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 06/16/2015, transaction number 1514339 and receipt number 402516. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketWrit issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketCosts acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 5628.39. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketPostjudgment credits acknowledged in the amount of 100.00. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketPostjudgment interest accrued 0.00. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Capital One Bank (USA) on 06/01/2015. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk associated on 05/21/2014. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 05/21/2014, transaction number 1344317 and receipt number 356024. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Holly, Carter. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Capital One Bank (USA) on 07/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank (USA) on 07/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) on 07/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - VICTOR S. PATENAUDE ESQ