This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 04:03:30 (UTC).

California State Parks et al. vs Denise Naranjo

Case Summary

On 12/30/2015 California State Parks filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against Denise Naranjo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2085

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

California State Parks

Respondent

Naranjo, Denise

Interested Party

Olson, Jeremy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/24/2016
View Court Documents

DocketOrder After Hearing filed by California State Parks, Denise Naranjo, Jeremy Olson. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2016

DocketHearing re: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on February 22, 2016. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on 02/22/2016 10:00 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2016
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Personal Service filed by California State Parks. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2016
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Naranjo, Denise. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2016

DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on 01/22/2016 10:30 AM. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2016

DocketHearing regarding: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order , set for 02/22/2016 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department M2. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2016
View Court Documents

DocketProof of service filed by California State Parks; Olson, Jeremy. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2015

DocketHearing regarding: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order , set for 01/22/2016 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department M2. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Olson, Jeremy; California State Parks. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2015
View Court Documents

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 12/31/2015. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Action Type: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2015
View Court Documents

DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence) filed by California State Parks. Action Type: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California State Parks. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2015

DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2015

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less