This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 06:13:46 (UTC).

Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing vs Yolanda Contreras et al.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc , a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Yolanda Contreras. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1614

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing

Defendants

Contreras, Yolanda

Rodriguez, Ben

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Yolanda Contreras served on 11/30/2017 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ben Rodriguez served on 11/30/2018 by . $55.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Yolanda Contreras, Ben Rodriguez Entered Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing against Yolanda Contreras, Ben Rodriguez in the amount of 44380.48. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Inc., Cal Sierra Leasing in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 361469. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys; Participant: Ben Rodriguez (Defendant); Participant: Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing (Plaintiff); Participant: Yolanda Contreras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing against Yolanda Contreras, Ben Rodriguez in the amount of 44380.48. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Yolanda Contreras, Ben Rodriguez Entered Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ben Rodriguez served on 11/30/2018 by . $55.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Yolanda Contreras served on 11/30/2017 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/30/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketAttorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, Inc., a California corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Inc., Cal Sierra Leasing in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 228128. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cal Sierra Leasing Inc dba Blackmun Equipment Leasing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K