This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 08:49:06 (UTC).

Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing vs Anselmo Barron

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 Cal Sierra Leasing, inc, a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anselmo Barron. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4973

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing

Defendant

Barron, Anselmo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint for Breach of Contract and for Damages filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Anselmo Barron served on 05/30/2017 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Anselmo Barron Entered Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

09/18/2017: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing against Anselmo Barron in the amount of 11991.10. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPayment received by David Ross in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 249807. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Linda L. Lofthus; Participant: Anselmo Barron (Defendant); Participant: Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing against Anselmo Barron in the amount of 11991.10. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Anselmo Barron Entered Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Anselmo Barron served on 05/30/2017 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/13/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketAttorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Breach of Contract and for Damages filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketPayment received by inc,. Cal Sierra Leasing in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 169594. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cal Sierra Leasing, inc,. a California Corporation, doing business as Blackmun Equipment Leasing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cal Sierra Leasing Inc dba Blackmun Equipment Leasing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K