This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 19:01:45 (UTC).

Bryson vs. Lang

Case Summary

On 05/13/2011 Bryson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Lang. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************7043

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bryson, Micelle

Bryson, Joe

Defendants

Lang, Kathy

Long, Steve

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

05/13/2011: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

05/13/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

05/13/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

05/13/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

06/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

06/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

06/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Certified Mail Enevelope

06/24/2011: Certified Mail Enevelope

Certified Mail Receipt

06/27/2011: Certified Mail Receipt

Minute Order

08/15/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/15/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/18/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/18/2011: Minute Order

Letter (Sitting on Assignment)

08/18/2011: Letter (Sitting on Assignment)

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

08/18/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

08/23/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketCase note created on 11/04/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • DocketCase status updated to Post Judgment effective 09/22/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 75 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 95 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Krueg, Angie to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketStatus of Michelle Bryson updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketStatus of Kathy Lang updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketStatus of Joe Bryson updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketStatus of Steve Lang updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketAddress for Steve Long selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketAddress for Micelle Bryson selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketAddress for Joe Bryson selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal $2150.00 plus $70.00 Cost. scheduled for 06/17/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in B1 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 17. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt filed by Bryson, Joe; Bryson, Micelle on 05/13/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Bryson, Joe; Bryson, Micelle on 05/13/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less