This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 06:18:22 (UTC).

Bryan Navarro et al. vs BARONHR WEST, iNC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Bryan Navarro filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARONHR WEST, iNC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8776

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cardenas, Irma

Navarro, Dania

Navarro, Bryan

Defendants

BARONHR GROUP, LLC

National Distribution Centers, LLC

BARONHR, LLC

Espino, Hilda

Legendary Staffing, Inc.

NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc

National Distribution Centers of Delaware, Inc.

Polanco, Priscilla

NFI Industries, Inc.

BARONHR WEST, iNC

Baronhr West, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Highman, Bruce J

Defendant Attorneys

Welch, Eric M.

Trinh, Maggie W.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Bryan Navarro, Dania Navarro, Irma Cardenas, Baronhr West, Inc., Baronhr, LLC, Baronhr Group, LLC, Legendary Staffing, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC, National Distribution Centers of Delaware, Inc., NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc, NFI Industries, Inc., Priscilla Polanco, Hilda Espino Entered. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Defendant National Distribution Centers, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Defendant National Distribution Centers, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by National Distribution Centers, LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without prejudice as to National Distribution Centers of Delaware, Inc., Priscilla Polanco, and Hilda Espino filed by Cardenas, Irma; Navarro, Bryan; Navarro, Dania. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Baronhr Group, LLC served on 07/23/2019 by Personal Service. $100.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to NFI Industries, Inc. served on 07/23/2019 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $15.60. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

George J. Abdallah Assigned. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to National Distribution Centers of Delaware, Inc., Priscilla Polanco, Hilda Espino. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Peremptory Challenge

Declaration of prejudice pursuant to 170.6 CCP as to Judge Holly filed by plaintiffs. Action Type: Peremptory Challenge pursuant to CCP 170.6; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan; Cardenas, Irma. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

(CORRECTED) DEFT National Distribution Centers, LLC's Answer to PLTF's First amended complaint

(CORRECTED) DEFT National Distribution Centers, LLC's Answer to PLTF's First amended complaint filed by National Distribution Centers, LLC. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to National Distribution Centers, LLC served on 07/23/2019 by Personal Service. $100.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Proof of service of disqualification of judge, notice of reassignment & notice of case management conference

Proof of service of disqualification of judge, notice of reassignment & notice of case management conference filed by Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan; Cardenas, Irma. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/07/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

#170.6

Declaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Holly, Carter.

First Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint for relief for violation of fair employment and housing act violation of labor code 1102.5 and 98.6; tortious violation of public policy; labor code private attorneys general act filed by Cardenas, Irma; Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan; Cardenas, Irma. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Notice of Related Cases NOT ORDERED signed by Judge Abdallah on 01/02/2020 filed by Bryan Navarro, Dania Navarro, Irma Cardenas. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Bryan Navarro, Dania Navarro, Irma Cardenas, Baronhr West, Inc., Baronhr, LLC, Baronhr Group, LLC, Legendary Staffing, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC, National Distribution Centers of Delaware, Inc., NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc, NFI Industries, Inc., Priscilla Polanco, Hilda Espino Entered. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan; Cardenas, Irma. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Maggie W. Trinh, retained for NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(CORRECTED) DEFT National Distribution Centers, LLC's Answer to PLTF's First amended complaint filed by National Distribution Centers, LLC. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFT NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc.'s Answer to PLTF's First Amended Complaint; First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Inc NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 473629. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Eric M. Welch, retained for Legendary Staffing, Inc. . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce J Highman, retained for Dania Navarro . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce J Highman, retained for Bryan Navarro . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce J Highman, retained for Irma Cardenas . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/06/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan; Cardenas, Irma. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Navarro, Dania; Navarro, Bryan; Cardenas, Irma. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Bryan Navarro in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 444028. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Legendary Staffing, Inc., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation is a litigant