This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/01/2022 at 04:57:01 (UTC).

Bryan Navarro vs BaronHR West, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Bryan Navarro filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BaronHR West, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7065

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cardenas, Irma

Navarro, Dania

Navarro, Bryan

Defendants

Legendary Staffing, Inc., a corporation

National Distribution Centers, LLC, a limited liability company

NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation

BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company

BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation

BaronHR Group, LLC, a limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Highman, Bruce J

Defendant Attorneys

Welch, Eric M.

Huibonhoa, Katherine

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Eric M. Welch in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc. a corporation; BaronHR Group, LLC, a limited liability company, et al. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Declaration

Supplemental Declaration of Dania Navarro in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Cardenas, Irma; Navarro, Bryan; Navarro, Dania. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Order on Related Cases

NOT RELATED -- Order on Notice of Related Cases, CRC 3.300(h) signed by Judge Abdallah on 01/02/2020 filed by Bryan Navarro, Dania Navarro, Irma Cardenas. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; Declaration of Bruce Highman in Support of Stipulation; Order signed by Judge Lee entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Statement

Defendants' Statement in Response to the Court's Minute Order Dated November 10, 2020; and Notice of Errata filed by NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation; National Distribution Centers, LLC, a limited liability company; NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc. a corporation. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference Status of Stay (PAGA Claim), set for 07/30/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiffs and all named defendants. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel, Further Case Management Conference held on 11/10/2020 09:00 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 11/24/2020 04:10 PM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: BaronHR Group, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: Bryan Navarro (Plaintiff); Participant: Dania Navarro (Plaintiff); Participant: Irma Cardenas (Plaintiff); Participant: Legendary Staffing, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc. a corporation (Defendant); Participant: NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: National Distribution Centers, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: BaronHR Group, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: Bryan Navarro (Plaintiff); Participant: Dania Navarro (Plaintiff); Participant: Irma Cardenas (Plaintiff); Participant: Legendary Staffing, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc. a corporation (Defendant); Participant: NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: National Distribution Centers, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference Status of Stay (PAGA Claim), set for 08/30/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; Declaration of Bruce Highman in Support of Stipulation; Order signed by Judge Lee entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Plaintiffs and all named defendants. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Irma Cardenas in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 660454. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: BaronHR Group, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: Bryan Navarro (Plaintiff); Participant: Dania Navarro (Plaintiff); Participant: Irma Cardenas (Plaintiff); Participant: Legendary Staffing, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: NFI Industries aka National Distribution Center, Inc. a corporation (Defendant); Participant: NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Participant: National Distribution Centers, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference Status of Stay (PAGA Claim), set for 07/30/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Cal. in error Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/19/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Navarro, Dania; Cardenas, Irma; Navarro, Bryan. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navarro, Dania; Cardenas, Irma; Navarro, Bryan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Bryan Navarro in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 514501. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce J Highman, retained for Irma Cardenas . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce J Highman, retained for Dania Navarro . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce J Highman, retained for Bryan Navarro . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where NFI Industries, Inc., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BaronHR, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Legendary Staffing, Inc., a corporation is a litigant