This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 02:32:55 (UTC).

Brieauna Ford vs Jeffrey Munnecke

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 Brieauna Ford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jeffrey Munnecke. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5191

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford, Brieauna

Defendant

Munnecke, Jeffrey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teddington, Gina C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Ford, Brieauna. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford, Brieauna. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeffrey Munnecke served on 07/12/2021 by Personal Service. $85.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Brieauna Ford (Plaintiff); Participant: Jeffrey Munnecke (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jeffrey Munnecke served on 07/12/2021 by Personal Service. $85.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/06/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Ford, Brieauna. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford, Brieauna. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Brieauna Ford in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 651804. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Gina C. Teddington, retained for Brieauna Ford . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teddington, Gina C