This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 10:12:50 (UTC).

BRG Investment Inc vs. Jorge Chavez

Case Summary

On 11/23/2011 BRG Investment Inc filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Jorge Chavez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6014

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brg Investment Inc

Defendant

Chavez, Jorge

Assignee

Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment

11/16/2012: Assignment of Judgment

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

02/08/2012: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Minute Order

01/23/2012: Minute Order

Notice of Court Trial

01/10/2012: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

01/10/2012: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

01/04/2012: UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

01/04/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

01/04/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

UD105 Answer

11/29/2011: UD105 Answer

POS040 Proof of Service

11/29/2011: POS040 Proof of Service

Payment Receipt

11/29/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice That You've Been Sued

11/23/2011: Notice That You've Been Sued

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

11/23/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2011: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

UD100 Complaint

11/23/2011: UD100 Complaint

Notice that you have been sued

11/23/2011: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

11/23/2011: Payment Receipt

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2012
  • Address for James Struck selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Complaint associated on 12/12/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Complaint associated on 12/12/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. added as a Assignee effective 12/12/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by BRG Investment Inc; Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. on 11/16/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by BRG Investment Inc on 11/16/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2012
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2011
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Original Summons filed by BRG Investment Inc on 11/23/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BRG Investment Inc on 11/23/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • Complaint filed by BRG Investment Inc on 11/23/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. is a litigant