This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 14:45:04 (UTC).

Brett Seropian vs Larry Dean Lewis

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 Brett Seropian filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Larry Dean Lewis. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barrera, Gus. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1977

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barrera, Gus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seropian, Brett

Defendant

Lewis, Larry Dean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hyppa, Richard G

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

03/01/2017: NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Larry Dean Lewis and all occupants Entered. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Seropian, Brett. Service date 03/14/17, fees $25.00. Post and mail. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Larry Dean Lewis served on 03/14/2017 by Post & Mail. $65.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Brett Seropian against Larry Dean Lewis filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Brett Seropian against Larry Dean Lewis filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Larry Dean Lewis and all occupants Entered. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Seropian, Brett. Service date 03/14/17, fees $25.00. Post and mail. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Larry Dean Lewis served on 03/14/2017 by Post & Mail. $65.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 153840. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Payment received by Richard Hyppa in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 149363. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Attorney, Richard G Hyppa, retained for Brett Seropian . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Payment received by Richard Hyppa in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 146644. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Seropian, Brett. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hyppa, Richard G