Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 18:40:41 (UTC).

Brenda Williams et al. vs Teichert, Inc. dba Teichert Construction et al.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Brenda Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Teichert, Inc dba Teichert Construction. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1722

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

Williams, Delandre

Williams, Brenda

Williams, Delmonie

Williams, Delbrena

Defendants

Teichert, Inc. dba Teichert Construction

Meza, Jose

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

Williams, Brenda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Minor and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Moore, Roger A

 

Court Documents

dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Brenda Williams, Delmonie Williams, Delandre Williams, Delbrena Williams, Teichert, Inc. dba Teichert Construction, Jose Meza, Brenda Williams Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal RE Dismissal for failure to appear at the CMC hearing, failure to file a CMC Statement and failure to file a Proof of Service., set for 04/16/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/19/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Delandre Williams, Brenda Williams. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Delbrena Williams, Brenda Williams. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Delmonie Williams, Brenda Williams. Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Delandre; Williams, Brenda; Williams, Delmonie; Williams, Delbrena. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Williams, Delandre; Williams, Brenda; Williams, Delmonie; Williams, Delbrena. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Brenda Williams, Delmonie Williams, Delandre Williams, Delbrena Williams, Teichert, Inc. dba Teichert Construction, Jose Meza, Brenda Williams Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Williams, Brenda; Williams, Brenda. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal RE Dismissal for failure to appear at the CMC hearing, failure to file a CMC Statement and failure to file a Proof of Service., set for 04/16/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/19/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 19, 2019. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Brenda Williams . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Delandre Williams, Brenda Williams. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Delbrena Williams, Brenda Williams. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/19/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Delandre Williams . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Delmonie Williams . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Brenda Williams . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Williams, Delandre; Williams, Brenda; Williams, Delmonie; Williams, Delbrena. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Delandre; Williams, Brenda; Williams, Delmonie; Williams, Delbrena. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Delbrena Williams . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Payment received by Brenda Williams in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 337686. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teichert, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moore, Roger A