Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 13:23:18 (UTC).

Bobby Boyd vs Julio Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 Bobby Boyd filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Julio Gonzalez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1051

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boyd, Bobby

Defendant

Gonzalez, Julio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drake, Benjamin

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Bobby Boyd, Julio Gonzalez Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 08/31/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions 1) failure to appear on 6/27/2017 pursuant to CCP code, section 177.5 and 2) failure to file a request for dismissal pursuant to CRC, rule 3.1385(c)(2), set for 08/31/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 06/27/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

fax transmital

06/20/2017: fax transmital

AMENDED -Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal after Notice of Settlement, set for 06/27/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Hearing

05/18/2017: Notice of Hearing

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Hearing Result: Court's OSC hearing Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Bobby Boyd, Julio Gonzalez Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions 1) failure to appear on 6/27/2017 pursuant to CCP code, section 177.5 and 2) failure to file a request for dismissal pursuant to CRC, rule 3.1385(c)(2), set for 10/18/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 08/31/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on August 31, 2017. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions 1) failure to appear on 6/27/2017 pursuant to CCP code, section 177.5 and 2) failure to file a request for dismissal pursuant to CRC, rule 3.1385(c)(2), set for 08/31/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 06/27/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on June 27, 2017. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/28/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Attorney, Benjamin Drake, retained for Bobby Boyd . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Boyd, Bobby. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Payment received by Bobby Boyd in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 139216. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAKE BENJAMIN