This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 10:35:34 (UTC).

Board of Directors vs. Board of Deacons

Case Summary

On 11/05/2010 Board of Directors filed an Other lawsuit against Board of Deacons. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8569

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jones, Napoleon

Board Of Directors, Greater Faith Missionary Baptist Church Of Stockton California

Respondents

Board Of Deacons Of Greater Faith Missionary Baptist Church Of Stockton California

Holland, Sheridan

Watkins, William

Thomas, Issac

Jones, Douglas

Cobin, Alpha

Salter, Roosevelt

Miles, Glenn

Riley, Edward

Thomas, Julius

Franklin, Roscoe

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

08/28/2012: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

12/05/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

08/18/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/21/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

06/03/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

05/16/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

05/09/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

03/07/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

12/01/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

11/14/2012: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

04/04/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

03/07/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/05/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

07/05/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

02/16/2011: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

02/14/2011: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

12/29/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/05/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2013
  • Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 9.50 on 10/03/2013, transaction number 1235400 and receipt number 326850. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 17.50 on 11/14/2012, transaction number 1081514 and receipt number 287643. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 1.00 on 08/28/2012, transaction number 1043867 and receipt number 277554. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Complaint - Amended associated on 07/25/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Complaint - Amended disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Status of Napoleon Jones updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Status of Board of Directors, Greater Faith Missionary Baptist Church of Stockton California updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Status of William Watkins updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
510 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet updated 11/05/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Status of Napoleon Jones updated to Active/Self-Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Petition - Other (case initiation) updated 11/05/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • San Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Napoleon Jones) filed by Board of Directors, Greater Faith Missionary Baptist Church of Stockton California; Jones, Napoleon on 11/05/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Board of Directors, Greater Faith Missionary Baptist Church of Stockton California on 11/05/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Petition - Other (case initiation) filed by Board of Directors, Greater Faith Missionary Baptist Church of Stockton California on 11/05/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less