Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/15/2018 at 07:58:58 (UTC).

Beverly Ann Bancroft vs Richard Harold Bancroft

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 Beverly Ann Bancroft filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Richard Harold Bancroft. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3914

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bancroft, Beverly Ann

Respondent

Bancroft, Richard Harold

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Torres, Eddie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • Proof of service filed by Bancroft, Richard Harold. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Bancroft, Beverly Ann. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Attorney, Eddie Torres, retained for Richard Harold Bancroft . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Richard Harold Bancroft. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Bancroft, Richard Harold. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Proof of service filed by Bancroft, Richard Harold. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Bancroft, Richard Harold. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Bancroft, Richard Harold. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Richard Harold Bancroft filed. Served on 07/14/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Payment received by Beverly Bancroft in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 188980. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Bancroft, Beverly Ann. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Bancroft, Beverly Ann. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Bancroft, Beverly Ann. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Bancroft, Richard Harold. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Torres, Eddie