This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/06/2023 at 10:33:30 (UTC).

Bertha Gonzales vs Stanley Alan Tuchethagen

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Bertha Gonzales filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against Stanley Alan Tuchethagen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez, Danielle Y.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0110

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez, Danielle Y.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gonzales, Bertha

Respondent

Tuchethagen, Stanley Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/31/2023

HearingHearing Type: Elder Abuse Restraining Order; Court Room: 4B; Result: Held; Judge: Danielle Y. Ramirez; Participants; Bertha Gonzales (Petitioner); Stanley Alan Tuchethagen (Respondent)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDismissal-Other-Filing Entered as of 01/31/2023; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketHearing re: Elder Abuse Restraining Order held on January 31, 2023.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketMinutes finalized for Elder Abuse Restraining Order held on 01/31/2023 08:15 AM .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023

DocketProof of Service of EA-100, EA-109, and EA-110 by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Stanley Alan Tuchethagen served on 01/19/2023 by Personal Service. $40.00.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Elder Abuse Restraining Order Elder Abuse (Bertha Gonzales) *NO POS, set for 01/31/2023 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 01/09/2023.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Bertha Gonzales.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketDeclaration Re: Ex Parte Application.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketRequest for Elder Abuse or Dependent Abuse Restraining Order filed by Gonzales, Bertha.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less