This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:55:28 (UTC).

Bernardina Oliva Tomasa vs In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 Bernardina Oliva Tomasa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mulvihill, Michael and Lee, Jayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3545

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mulvihill, Michael

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tomasa, Bernardina Oliva

Defendant

In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Serna, Jessie

Defendant Attorney

Kilduff, Douglas M.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Bernardina Oliva Tomasa, In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC Entered. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tomasa, Bernardina Oliva. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Tomasa, Bernardina Oliva. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Bernardina Oliva Tomasa (Plaintiff); Participant: In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Bernardina Oliva Tomasa, In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC Entered. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Tomasa, Bernardina Oliva. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received by LLC In-Shape Health Clubs in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 578960. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Douglas M. Kilduff, retained for In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received by LLC In-Shape Health Clubs in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 563872. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketJayne Lee Assigned. BATCH Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/11/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Tomasa, Bernardina Oliva. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tomasa, Bernardina Oliva. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Bernardina Tomasa in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 547564. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Jessie Serna, retained for Bernardina Oliva Tomasa . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kilduff, Douglas M.