This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 04:30:44 (UTC).

Berco Redwood, Inc. vs Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction et al.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Berco Redwood, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Intelligent Construction Inc , dba Tioga Lumber and Construction. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9305

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berco Redwood, Inc.

Defendants

Coe, James

Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction

Maddix, Dennis

Western Surety Bond Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hoover, Shane M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Western Surety Bond Company.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to James Coe served on 10/30/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction served on 11/04/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dennis Maddix served on 11/03/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction, James Coe Not Entered

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/05/2022 08:45 AM .

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Berco Redwood, Inc. (Plaintiff); Dennis Maddix (Defendant); Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction (Defendant); James Coe (Defendant); Western Surety Bond Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Held; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Berco Redwood, Inc. (Plaintiff); Dennis Maddix (Defendant); Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction (Defendant); James Coe (Defendant); Western Surety Bond Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/06/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on April 5, 2022.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/05/2022 08:45 AM .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..; Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction, James Coe Not Entered; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..; Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dennis Maddix served on 11/03/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Intelligent Construction Inc., dba Tioga Lumber and Construction served on 11/04/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Western Surety Bond Company.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..; Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/05/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..; Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Shane M Hoover, retained for Berco Redwood, Inc. .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Berco Redwood, Inc..; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Berco Redwood in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 685886.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berco Redwood, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant