This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/01/2017 at 16:18:19 (UTC).

Benjamin Cromwell vs Min Zheng M.D.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 Benjamin Cromwell filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Min Zheng M D. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9086

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cromwell, Benjamin

Defendants

Zheng M.D., Min

Rapert, PA-C, Jerry E

Ghavami, M.D., individually, and doing business as Lodi Urgent Care, Mobin P.

Sutter Health

Sutter Gould Medical Foundation

Holm, N.P., Seth M.

Sutter Health Pacific

Grant Line Pharmacy, Inc.

California Urgent Care Center, Professional Corporation

Zheng M.D., individually, and doing business as Tracy Rehabilitation and Pain Management Center, Min

Delgado, DO, Carlos H

Sutter Medical Group, A California Corporation

BZ Medical Corporation

Grant FM LLC

Minors

Cromwell, Abagail

Cromwell, Addilynn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mastagni, David P.

Defendant Attorneys

Wiesner, Frederick George

Reihl, Lori Ann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • FILE: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Delgado, DO, Carlos H. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • FILE: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Cromwell, Benjamin. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • ORDER: Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Benjamin Cromwell, Min Zheng M.D., individually, and doing business as Tracy Rehabilitation and Pain Management Center, Abagail Cromwell, Addilynn Cromwell, BZ Medical Corporation, Grant FM LLC, Grant Line Pharmacy, Inc., Carlos H Delgado, DO, Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, Sutter Health, Sutter Health Pacific, Sutter Medical Group, A California Corporation, Mobin P. Ghavami, M.D., individually, and doing business as Lodi Urgent Care, Jerry E Rapert, PA-C, Seth M. Holm, N.P., California Urgent Care Center, Professional Corporation Entered. Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • CASESTAT: Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • HV: Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • FILE: Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Cromwell, Benjamin. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • FILE: Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Grant Line Pharmacy, Inc.. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • SHSET: Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • HRA: Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • FDDOG: Disqualification of Judge under Affidavit or Declaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2016
  • SUMIS: Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • JUOF: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Benjamin Cromwell. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • SHSET: Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • ATTORNEY RETAINED: Attorney, David P. Mastagni, retained for Benjamin Cromwell . Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • NOCASI: Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • CI: Case initiated. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • ACCTPMT: Payment received by Benjamin Cromwell in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 100545. Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • SUMIS: Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • FILE: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cromwell, Benjamin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • FILE: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cromwell, Benjamin. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Linda L. Lofthus.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization is a litigant

Latest cases where ZHENG, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH PACIFIC is a litigant