This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 02:04:27 (UTC).

Beck Investments Co Inc vs. Sandra Schoppe

Case Summary

On 08/10/2011 Beck Investments Co Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sandra Schoppe. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1227

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beck Investments Co Inc

Defendant

Schoppe, Sandra

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

09/29/2011: EJ130 Writ of Execution

Payment Receipt

09/14/2011: Payment Receipt

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

09/09/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

09/09/2011: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Application for Order

08/18/2011: Application for Order

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

08/15/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Notice That You've Been Sued

08/10/2011: Notice That You've Been Sued

Notice that you have been sued

08/10/2011: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

08/10/2011: Payment Receipt

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

11/02/2011: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

MC010 Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/14/2011: MC010 Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony

10/14/2011: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

10/14/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Order Allowing Service of Summons

08/19/2011: Order Allowing Service of Summons

Payment Receipt

08/18/2011: Payment Receipt

UD100 Amended Complant

08/15/2011: UD100 Amended Complant

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

08/10/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Complaint

08/10/2011: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Complaint - Amended (costs $470.00) associated on 11/02/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Complaint - Amended (for court judgment) associated on 11/02/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Complaint - Amended disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Complaint - Amended associated on 11/02/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Status of Sandra Schoppe updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Status of Beck Investments Co Inc updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Complaint - Amended associated on 11/02/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • No Forms generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Judgment for Beck Investments Co Inc, against Schoppe, Sandra in the amount of 4562.00 total damages including 470.00 prejudgment costs, 0.00 attorney fees and 0.00 prejudgment interest. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2011
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 08/10/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 08/10/2011, transaction number 841881 and receipt number 225350. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Beck Investments Co Inc on 08/10/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Beck Investments Co Inc on 08/10/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Complaint filed by Beck Investments Co Inc on 08/10/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BECK INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant