This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 18:06:00 (UTC).

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC vs Houston Transloading, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company et al.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Baxter, Bailey, Associates, Inc , a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Houston Transloading, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0893

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC

Defendants

Houston Transloading, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company

Mccollister's Transportation Systems, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Omega Global Logistics Inc., a New Jersey Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grant, Richard L.

 

Court Documents

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC.

CM-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Answer

Defendant Landstar Global Logistics, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. a Delaware Corporation.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/04/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. a Delaware Corporation.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC (Plaintiff); Houston Transloading, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Mccollister's Transportation Systems, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Omega Global Logistics Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. a Delaware Corporation.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Stephanie L. Freismuth, retained for Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. a Delaware Corporation .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/04/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Landstar Global Logistics, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. a Delaware Corporation.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Landstar Global Logistics in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 815656.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Bailey, Baxter in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 808741.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Richard L. Grant, retained for Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., a Corporation, an Assignee of UKI LLC .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less