This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 21:15:47 (UTC).

Basalite Building Products, LLC vs Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc. a California corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 Basalite Building Products, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5943

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Basalite Building Products, LLC

Defendants

Myers and Sons Construction, LP, a California limited partnership

Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc. a California corporation

California Department of Transportation

Flowers, Raymond C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yanagihara, Jr., Daniel S.

Defendant Attorney

Wong, Jidi

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Basalite Building Products, LLC, Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc. a California corporation, Myers and Sons Construction, LP, a California limited partnership, California Department of Transportation, Raymond C. Flowers Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc., a California Corporation; Myers and Sons Construction, LP a CA Limited Partership; and Raymond C. Flowers, an individual, NOT ENTERED; Plaintiff named in #1b is not named Plaintiff. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Defendant State of California Department of Transportation's Answer to an Unverified Complaint

Defendant State of California Department of Transportation's Answer to an Unverified Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Myers and Sons Construction, LP, a California limited partnership served on 06/21/2017 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to California Department of Transportation served on 06/19/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Raymond C. Flowers served on 06/20/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc. a California corporation served on 06/20/2017 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Basalite Building Products, LLC, Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc. a California corporation, Myers and Sons Construction, LP, a California limited partnership, California Department of Transportation, Raymond C. Flowers Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc., a California Corporation; Myers and Sons Construction, LP a CA Limited Partership; and Raymond C. Flowers, an individual, NOT ENTERED; Plaintiff named in #1b is not named Plaintiff. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendant State of California Department of Transportation's Answer to an Unverified Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Attorney, Jidi Wong, retained for California Department of Transportation . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Myers and Sons Construction, LP, a California limited partnership served on 06/21/2017 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to California Department of Transportation served on 06/19/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Norcal Masonry Builders, Inc. a California corporation served on 06/20/2017 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Raymond C. Flowers served on 06/20/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/06/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Payment received by LLC Basalite Building Products in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 177763. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Basalite Building Products, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Attorney, Daniel S. Yanagihara, Jr., retained for Basalite Building Products, LLC . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYERS & SONS ? GRIFFITH A JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG, JIDI