This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:01 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs Vidya Kumari-Chandra,

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vidya Kumari-Chandra. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1969

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Kumari-Chandra,, Vidya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

 

Court Documents

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Vidya Kumari-Chandra, served on 03/17/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Barclays Bank Delaware against Vidya Kumari-Chandra, in the amount of $2703.31. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Vidya Kumari-Chandra, on 03/02/2017 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Payment received by Barclays Bank Delaware in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 147077. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Payment received by Barclays Bank Delaware in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 132128. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Barclays Bank Delaware against Vidya Kumari-Chandra, in the amount of $2703.31. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Request for Default against Vidya Kumari-Chandra, Entered Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Vidya Kumari-Chandra, served on 03/17/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Robert Scott Kennard, retained for Barclays Bank Delaware . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 35102. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less